HELSTON DOWNSLAND CHARITY

Charity number: 235477
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 02 January 2022 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 05 January 2018 On time Download