DESBOROUGH TOWN WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 235505
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 06 February 2017 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required