Accounts and annual returns CHARITY OF AGNES ALICE HOTTON

Charity number: 235513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 March 2020 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required