Financial history CHARITY OF AGNES ALICE HOTTON

Charity number: 235513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £25 £20 £27 £27 £27
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £30 £27
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A