Accounts and annual returns THE WILL EDMONDS CLINICAL RESEARCH FUND

Charity number: 235573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required