Financial history STANTON LAND FUND

Charity number: 235649
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £4.73k £4.79k £4.79k £5.99k £4.79k
Total expenditure £4.84k £5.40k £5.29k £5.99k £5.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A