Accounts and annual returns THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE TIVERTON HOSPITALS

Charity number: 235757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required