THE HAPPY WANDERERS AMBULANCE ORGANISATION

Charity number: 235857
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.41k £9.05k £10.15k £10.27k £9.73k
Total expenditure £8.90k £10.57k £11.95k £11.22k £7.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A