EXETER AND DISTRICT MENCAP SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide information and support to those with learning disabilities and their parents/carers/families. We have provided an inclusive playpark in Exeter. We make grants towards holidays for carers and those with a learning disability and we donate money on a regular basis towards the running of a social evening for people with a learning disability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 07 August 1964: Standard registration
- EXETER AND DISTRICT MENCAP (Working name)
- EXETER AND DISTRICT SOCIETY FOR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN (Previous name)
- EXETER AND DISTRICT SOCIETY FOR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN AND ADULTS (Previous name)
- EXETER MENCAP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN GUARD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Robert Gaiger | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Helyar | Trustee | 22 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Ferrity | Trustee | 19 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
HILARY GARNSWORTHY | Trustee | 16 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
JENNY DENHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MIRIAM GUARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN WALDRON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.94k | £69.09k | £175 | £4.70k | £390 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.48k | £22.47k | £4.30k | £8.69k | £10.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 10 August 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 10 August 2021 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 11 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION ADOPTED JANUARY 1964 AS AMENDED 28TH FEBRUARY 1980, 13TH DECEMBER 1984, 30TH NOVEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF HELP AND SUPPORT FOR THEM AND FOR THEIR FAMILIES, DEPENDANTS AND CARERS, AND TO PREVENT LEARNING DISABILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND TO ADVANCE RELIGION AMONGST PERSONS WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY; AND B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF BY REASON OF LEARNING DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
EXETER AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wortham Jaques
130a High Street
CREDITON
EX17 3LQ
- Phone:
- 01363774593
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window