Financial history FRIENDS OF ESSEX CHURCHES TRUST

Charity number: 236033
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £135.91k £142.80k £193.96k £145.66k £294.46k
Total expenditure £318.20k £114.14k £195.22k £163.64k £134.91k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A