THE CHARITY CALLED OR KNOWN AS THE POOR'S LAND OR POOR'S CLOSE

Charity number: 236068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.01k £822 £1.37k £882 £1.57k
Total expenditure £1.57k £967 £1.51k £65 £1.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A