ELEVENTH CHURCH OF CHRIST, SCIENTIST, LONDON

Charity number: 236093
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 27 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 27 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 27 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 27 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 23 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 23 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 27 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 27 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 29 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 29 August 2017 On time Download