WOOTTON TOWN HOUSES CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity administers the running of six small cottages for the occupancy of the poor or needy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 24 September 1964: Standard registration
- WOOTTON TOWN HOUSES CHARITY (Working name)
- THE WOOTTON POOR HOUSES CHARITY (Previous name)
- THE WOOTTON TOWN HOUSES CHARITY (Previous name)
- WOOTTON POOR HOUSES CHARITY (Previous name)
- WOOTTON TOWN (OR POOR) HOUSES CHARITY (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward Vincent McDonough | Chair | 13 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Martin Millichamp | Trustee | 08 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Christopher Lee | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Lloyd | Trustee | 21 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.23k | £21.95k | £21.63k | £23.06k | £22.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.57k | £7.45k | £19.97k | £8.07k | £27.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 6TH MARCH 1980 AS AMENDED ON 17 AUG 2017
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS IN THE ALMSHOUSES OF THE CHARITY OR ANY OF THEM IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
WOOTTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
80 High Street
Wootton
NORTHAMPTON
NN4 6JR
- Phone:
- 01604767599
- Email:
- john.lloyd15@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window