THE VASSAR-SMITH FUND

Charity number: 236381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General Charitable Purposes Medical/Health/Sickness Disability Relief of Poverty

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 02 August 2024

Total income: £47,704
Total expenditure: £25,434

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 May 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LLOYDS TSB PRIVATE BANKING LTD Trustee 11 July 2019
JOHN HENRY HAROLD FERRER DECEASED WILL TRUST
Received: On time
A G DOBLE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 02/08/2020 02/08/2021 02/08/2022 02/08/2023 02/08/2024
Total gross income £41.40k £35.95k £35.80k £41.16k £47.70k
Total expenditure £24.08k £24.88k £24.51k £41.32k £25.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 02 August 2024 27 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 August 2024 27 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 02 August 2023 01 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 August 2023 01 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 02 August 2022 02 January 2024 214 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 August 2022 02 January 2024 214 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 02 August 2021 23 January 2023 235 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 August 2021 23 January 2023 235 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 02 August 2020 02 September 2021 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 August 2020 02 September 2021 92 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED AT BIRMINGHAM ON 31 DECEMBER 1948 AND SCHEME OF 21 NOVEMBER 1973
Charitable objects
TO BE MADE AVIALABLE AS INTEREST OR CAPITAL OR BOTH AS GRANTS IN ASSISTING THE STAFF OF LLOYDS BANK LIMITED WHO ARE MEDICALLY INCIPIENT CASES ONLY OF TUBERCULAR COMPLAINTS TO GO TO HIGH CLIMATES TO REGAIN THEIR HEALTH, IF THE INCOME IS NOT REQUIRED FOR THIS PURPOSE THE INCOME MAY BE APPLIED FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF THE VASSER-SMITH FUND.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 28 May 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Affinity
Bedford Heights
Brickhill Drive
BEDFORD
MK41 7PH
Phone:
01234 262868
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available