CHARITY OF MARY ANN LE FEAVER

Charity number: 236408
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £67 £135 £120 £78 £81
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £500
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A