THE BROTHERS OF THE FIRST ORDER OF THE SOCIETY OF ST FRANCIS

Charity number: 236464
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 14 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 14 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 18 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 18 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 22 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 22 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 16 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 16 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 27 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 January 2017 On time Download