Financial history CHARITY KNOWN AS THE THORNE CHARITY

Charity number: 236517
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.11k £1.16k £1.19k £1.20k £1.14k
Total expenditure £1.05k £1.10k £1.10k £1.10k £1.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A