Accounts and annual returns LEGION OF MARY (SENATUS OF LIVERPOOL)

Charity number: 236522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 27 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 27 November 2024 241 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 07 June 2023 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 07 June 2023 433 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 22 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required