Trustees MARPLE CIVIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 236593
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geoffrey Robert Green | Chair | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joan Marilyn Dewhurst | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robin John West | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Elizabeth Hodskinson | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Philip William Mills | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Gregory Michael Pike | Trustee | 08 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Ronald Jessop | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
J R Andrew Moorhouse | Trustee | 24 March 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.