Financial history DAISIE RICH TRUST

Charity number: 236706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £176.27k £150.96k £164.30k £152.01k £158.00k
Total expenditure £182.01k £169.62k £182.59k £161.65k £185.22k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A