Financial history V AND E FLEMING 1964 TRUST

Charity number: 236710
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £56.29k £63.64k £66.57k £53.26k £57.88k
Total expenditure £103.46k £25.90k £90.00k £86.98k £113.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A