Trustees SOUTH LONDON LIBERAL SYNAGOGUE
Charity number: 236711

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eve Samson | Chair | 13 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Howard-Schiff | Trustee | 20 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Francis Infield | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Diego Giraldo Casas | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Denise Downes | Trustee | 31 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison May Watson | Trustee | 31 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maya Jaffe | Trustee | 12 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Brian William Jacobs | Trustee | 12 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
MR Andy Hoffman | Trustee | 08 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM COHEN | Trustee | 03 February 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.