BLETCHINGLEY UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 236747
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The relief either generally or individually of persons resident in the Parish of Bletchingley who are in conditions of need, hardship or distress.The Trustees apply the income of the charity for that purpose by making grants of money or providing or paying for items or services.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £20,354
Total expenditure: £13,437

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 September 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christine Ann BOLSHAW Chair 26 October 2022
None on record
Reverend Captain Paul Thomas Fitzpatrick CA SCP Trustee 18 October 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, BLETCHINGLEY
Received: On time
THE PERKINS ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
ANN ELIZABETH PRESSEY Trustee 22 February 2023
THE PERKINS ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, BLETCHINGLEY
Received: On time
Jeffrey Black Trustee 18 October 2018
None on record
Kim Wantling Trustee 01 August 2017
None on record
Dr MICHAEL GLOVER Trustee 08 February 2013
None on record
WENDY MASON Trustee
None on record
DAVID MARTIN Trustee
VILLAGE HALL (BLETCHINGLEY)
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £17.50k £13.52k £12.06k £12.72k £20.35k
Total expenditure £15.04k £13.86k £13.31k £15.74k £13.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.50k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 10 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 02 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 21 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 15 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 11 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 15 JANUARY 1907 AS VARIED BY SCHEME 5 FEBRUARY 1975
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS
Area of benefit
PARISH BLETCHINGLEY
Registration history
  • 17 September 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
17A Tilgate Common
Bletchingley
REDHILL
RH1 4NP
Phone:
01883743000
Website:

No information available