THE INLIGHT TRUST

Charity number: 236782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £317.98k £303.47k £353.63k £377.81k £345.30k
Total expenditure £330.25k £270.95k £368.84k £346.25k £454.81k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A