THE INLIGHT TRUST

Charity number: 236782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Summerfield Trustee 07 July 2020
THE TRUEMARK TRUST Received: On time
JUDY HAYWARD Chair
THE TRUEMARK TRUST Received: On time
Jane Ann DUNHAM Trustee 30 June 2015
THE TRUEMARK TRUST Received: On time
SHIRLEY VENING Trustee 26 February 2018
THE TRUEMARK TRUST Received: On time
Sharon Kelly Knight Trustee 03 October 2013
THE TRUEMARK TRUST Received: On time
Stephen George Ellis Collins Trustee 11 March 2020
THE TRUEMARK TRUST Received: On time