THE DAUGHTERS OF CHARITY OF ST VINCENT DE PAUL

Charity number: 236803
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sister Sarah Margaret King-Turner Trustee 05 March 2021 None on record
Sister Mary Theresa BAIN Trustee 01 October 2014
OUT THERE SUPPORTING FAMILIES OF PRISONERS LIMITED Received: On time
Sister Kathleen Fox Trustee 21 September 2015
ST VINCENT'S CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
MARILLAC NEUROLOGICAL CARE CENTRE Received: On time
SISTER ELLEN FLYNN Trustee 26 September 2011 None on record
SISTER KATHLEEN HARTE Trustee None on record
Sister Maureen Ann Tinkler Trustee 17 February 2021 None on record
Sister Theresa Tighe Trustee 01 October 2014
CATHOLIC VOCATIONS PROJECT Overdue by 162 days
THE VINCENTIAN VOLUNTEERS LIMITED Received: On time
THE DAUGHTERS OF CHARITY OF ST. VINCENT DE PAUL SERVICES Received: On time