Accounts and annual returns JOHN LAING CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 236852
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 15 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window