Financial history THE COMMUNITY OF ST EDMUND OF THE ENGLISH CONGREGATION OF THE ORDER OF ST BENEDICT ESTABLISHED AT DOUAI ABBEY, WOOLHAMPTON, BERKSHIRE

Charity number: 236962
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £748.25k £1.93m £711.25k £610.60k £483.21k
Total expenditure £1.02m £1.14m £1.06m £901.19k £795.81k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £49.14k £55.41k
Income - Donations and legacies £254.86k £337.89k £316.36k £257.96k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £24.92k £25.17k £30.09k £10.89k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £178.89k £188.27k £173.98k £127.68k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £281.01k £172.26k £177.97k £148.45k N/A
Income - Other £8.57k £1.21m £12.85k £65.62k N/A
Income - Legacies £29.28k £128.73k £5.54k £36.42k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £942.63k £1.02m £998.59k £841.41k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £75.24k £120.83k £64.77k £59.78k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £109.47k £142.79k £84.88k £29.83k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £47.23k £46.42k £51.23k £50.07k N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A