Financial history SUTTON IN CRAVEN COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 236987
Charity reporting is overdue by 15 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £6.70k £5.60k £12.09k £585 £2.27k
Total expenditure £4.22k £6.79k £2.38k £1.76k £2.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A