Financial history CHARITY OF SYDNEY POOLE LOWDELL

Charity number: 237148
Charity reporting is overdue by 169 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £805 £59 £347 £354 £361
Total expenditure £0 £0 £250 £0 £4.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A