Financial history HONLEY AND DISTRICT AID IN SICKNESS FUND

Charity number: 237203
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £178 £388 £132 £131 £48
Total expenditure £250 £195 £612 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A