BRENTFORD RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 237353
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 April 2018 179 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 31 January 2017 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required