BRENTFORD RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 237353
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £4.17k £797 £739 £478 £1.24k
Total expenditure £1.74k £800 £240 £1.80k £825
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A