THE HALE COTTAGE TRUST

Charity number: 237465
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £2.77k £2.90k £2.91k £2.98k £3.04k
Total expenditure £2.72k £1.54k £1.42k £1.32k £2.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A