Financial history WHITNELL COLLENS PARROTT CHARITY

Charity number: 237608
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £575 £530 £603 £580 £662
Total expenditure £813 £550 £863 £1.06k £64
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A