JOHN TRIPP, OR THE BLUE COAT CHARITY

Charity Number: 237891
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Assisting disadvantaged people in Barton upon Humber to purchase footwear clothing bedding and other essential items

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £22,831
Total expenditure: £6,093

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • North Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 April 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BLUE COAT CHARITY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr TIMOTHY JOHN CHARLES BIRTWHISTLE Trustee 07 February 2025
None on record
KEITH VICKERS COUNCILLOR Trustee 07 February 2025
None on record
CHRISTINE PATTERSON Trustee 07 February 2025
None on record
MARGARET SIDELL Trustee 07 February 2025
None on record
NEIL JACQUES Trustee 10 December 2024
BARTON-ON-HUMBER CIVIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
Paul Vickers Trustee 12 December 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £18.50k £19.21k £16.86k £17.94k £22.83k
Total expenditure £22.68k £16.18k £19.46k £9.20k £6.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 April 2021 87 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 10 JUNE 1982
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR IN AUGMENTATION OF THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY OF JOHN TRIPP (OR THE BLUE COAT CHARITY) -237891
Area of benefit
BARTON UPON HUMBER
Registration history
  • 11 April 1967 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
23 Westfield Road
Barton-upon-Humber
DN18 5AA
Phone:
01652634614
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available