MRS CATHERINE MARY CASTLE'S TRUST (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)

Charity number: 204665-14
Removed charity
Governing document
WILL PROVED 12 JULY AND SCHEMES OF 4 MARCH 1924,15 SEPTEMBER 1959 AND 26 APRIL 1973
Charitable objects
RELIEF OF WOMEN RESIDENT IN BRISTOL OR IN COUNTIES OF GLOUCESTER OR SOMERSET BEING MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND, PARTICULARLY WIDOWS AND UNMARRIED DAUGHTERS OF MERCHANTS, BANKERS, PHYSICIANS, SURGEONS, BARRISTERS OR SOLICITORS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OR NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
BRISTOL GLOUCESTER OR SOMERSET
Registration history
  • 13 February 1962: Standard registration
  • 10 October 2005: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 10 October 2005: Funds transferred to 1109141-16 BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES' RELIEF IN NEED CHARIT...
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of