FELMERSHAM POOR'S ESTATE, OTHERWISE THE TOWN LOT

Charity Number: 238003
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Operates a trust for the benefit of the poor of the parish of Felmersham and to make a grant of one fourteenth part of the annual income to the parish church

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £860
Total expenditure: £1,032

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Bedford

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 January 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Paolo Di Leo Trustee 04 November 2019
None on record
Susan Whitehouse Trustee 01 May 2016
FRANCES EMILY PALMER
Received: On time
PETER JAMES HARTOP Trustee 20 May 2012
FELMERSHAM AND RADWELL COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £785 £1.18k £3.71k £872 £860
Total expenditure £784 £1.37k £4.34k £1.00k £1.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 28 MARCH 1911
Charitable objects
1/14 OF THE INCOME OF THE CHARITIES FOR THE REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE OF PARISH CHURCH
Area of benefit
PARISH OF FELMERSHAM
Registration history
  • 14 January 1965 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
46 MARRIOTTS CLOSE
FELMERSHAM
BEDFORD
MK43 7HD
Phone:
0000000000
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available