Accounts and annual returns BETHANIA BAPTIST CHAPEL - TRUST FUNDS AND PROPERTY HELD IN CONNEXION THEREWITH -

Charity number: 238037
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required