THE CHARLES WOLFSON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 238043
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 20 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 20 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 23 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 23 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 30 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 22 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 22 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 01 March 2017 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

01 March 2017 24 days late Download