THE CHARLES WOLFSON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 238043
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £6.32m £5.41m £8.01m £6.42m £6.40m
Total expenditure £6.91m £6.49m £7.61m £7.60m £6.50m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £6.30m £5.40m £8.00m £6.40m £6.30m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £16.65k £5.06k £12.88k £17.02k £98.84k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.91m £6.49m £7.61m £7.60m £6.44m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £60.91k
Expenditure - Governance £6.50k £6.80k £7.00k £7.20k £11.83k
Expenditure - Grants institution £6.87m £6.45m £7.58m £7.55m £6.35m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £60.91k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0