AGE CONCERN STEVENAGE

Charity number: 238099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 27 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 June 2017 125 days late Download