AGE CONCERN STEVENAGE

Charity number: 238099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £26.56k £10.73k £16.39k £18.75k £21.07k
Total expenditure £15.39k £17.79k £16.68k £10.33k £28.49k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £500 £0 N/A N/A