Accounts and annual returns JUBILEE HALL

Charity number: 238186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 March 2022 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 July 2021 257 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 February 2019 97 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required