Financial history JUBILEE HALL

Charity number: 238186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £13.57k £19.99k £14.99k £20.84k £22.26k
Total expenditure £12.55k £15.38k £13.98k £20.25k £11.78k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.24k £7.51k £3.00k £10.00k £10.10k