Trustees JUBILEE HALL

Charity number: 238186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR K DAVIS Chair 01 March 2017
None on record
Mark Fanning Trustee 05 October 2021
None on record
Catherine Elliott Trustee 10 August 2021
None on record
HILARY CHASE Trustee 24 March 2020
None on record
Suzanne Brown Trustee 10 September 2019
None on record
MARGARET HART Trustee 04 April 2017
None on record
Mark Edwards Trustee 10 March 2017
None on record