THE ROYAL ARTILLERY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 238197
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 01 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 25 August 2017 On time Download