FLORENCE HYLDA DENNIS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The invested funds of The Florence Hylda Dennis Trust are available to support the object of the charity, namely 'the relief of the elderly of Wisbech and the surrounding area in such ways as the trustees think fit and in particular to support the St Augustine's Day Centre, Wisbech'
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 03 December 1964: Standard registration
- HYLDA DENNIS TRUST (Working name)
- WISBECH ST AUGUSTINES H DENNIS TRUST (Working name)
- FLORENCE HYLDA DENNIS FOR A HOME FOR ELDERLY LADIES (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Iain Harold Mason | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr MICHAEL RICHARDSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £7.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £25.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 December 2023 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 20TH NOVEMBER 1997 as amended on 10 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE ELDERLY OF WISBECH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, AND IN PARTICULAR TO SUPPORT THE ST. AUGUSTINE'S DAY CENTRE, WISBECH.
Area of benefit
WISBECH AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. AUGUSTINES DAY CENTRE
ST. AUGUSTINES ROAD
WISBECH
PE13 3AH
- Phone:
- 01945585595
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window