SISTERS OF THE HOLY CROSS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 238426
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

02 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 27 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 08 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 08 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 16 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 16 June 2017 On time Download