Financial history KENDAL CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 238470
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £7.94k £3.94k £3.66k £3.77k £3.19k
Total expenditure £1.96k £2.70k £6.17k £3.93k £7.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A